FL H1429 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits dismemberment abortion; provides exception; provides penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dismemberment Abortion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#679 (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-01SenateReceived
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HousePassed; YEAS 72 NAYS 42 738
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-15HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 6
2018-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/15/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-07HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-02-07HouseFavorable by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 7
2018-02-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/07/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-24HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-01-24HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 6
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1890 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
390011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback