FL H1427 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DEP to adopt & implement rules for statewide maximum contaminant levels for specified pollutants by date certain; provides requirements for adopting & implementing such rules; requires DEP to annually review specified studies & laws & initiate certain rulemaking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Safe Drinking Water Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1720 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
403851Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403853Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback