FL H1423 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
Pending: House Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 9:00 am House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates special zones in City of Edgewood; provides boundaries, exception to general law, & requirements for special alcoholic beverage licenses for restaurants in described areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Edgewood, Orange County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21HouseAdded to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-16HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2022-01-16HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback