FL H1415 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates Integrated Destination Resort Commission within Department of Revenue to authorize & oversee limited gaming at up to five integrated destination resorts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Destination Resorts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-22 On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 8:30 am, 12 HOB --Workshopped
2011-03-14 Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 222
2011-03-08 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84925Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback