FL H1413 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain persons from being sentenced to mandatory minimum terms of imprisonment for specified offenses committed before specified date; requires resentencing for persons who committed those violations before specified date & are serving mandatory minimum terms; specifies procedures; provides for gain-time for such persons.
Title
Sentencing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S902 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 08701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1413 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1413/BillText/Filed/PDF |