FL H1411 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Chapter No. 2022-83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Chapter No. 2022-83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires floating solar facility to be permitted use in certain land use categories; requires local governments to promote expanded uses of floating solar facilities by taking specified actions; authorizes county or municipality to specify buffer & landscaping requirements; requires Office of Energy within DACS to submit recommendations to Legislature regarding floating solar facilities.
Title
Floating Solar Facilities
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Committee | Sen. Bryan Avila [R] | Rep. Juan Fernandez-Barquin [R] |
Rep. Michelle Salzman [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#562 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#562 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Chapter No. 2022-83 | |
2022-04-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-27 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1338 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-24 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-17 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2022-02-09 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-07 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-07 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-28 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-16 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-16 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1338 (Same As) 2022-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1411