FL H1405 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Pending: House Insurance And Banking Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides automatic stays in delinquency proceedings initiated by DFS against federal home loan bank insurer-members prohibit bank from being stayed or precluded from certain rights; requires banks to provide specified processes & establish specified timelines; prohibits receivers for federal home loan bank insurer-members from voiding transfers or obligations to make specified transfers relating to federal home loan security agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurer-members of Federal Home Loan Banks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseNow in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1888 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6269541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8172341Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback