FL H1403 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for compulsory membership in Florida Retirement System for certain governing bodies initially enrolled on or after specified date; requires certain benefits be paid to beneficiary who does not qualify as joint annuitant; authorizes eligible employees one opportunity to transfer between investment plan to pension plan within specified time; authorizes members to contribute more to Florida Retirement System for specified purpose.
Title
Florida Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1870 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 4501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1403 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1403/BillText/Filed/PDF |