FL H1401 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Pending: House Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies method of contracting municipality when specified percentage of landowners are not registered electors of area; specifies method of contracting municipality when there are no registered electors in area proposed to be contracted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Contraction Procedures

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1876 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Referred to Community Affairs; Ethics and Elections; Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171051Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback