FL H1401 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires AHCA to contract with private entity to establish & maintain statewide heart attack registry, subject to specific appropriation; requires hospitals to provide certain information to such registry; requires contracted entity to use nationally recognized platform to collect data & report on certain performance measures to agency; provides hospitals immunity from liability under certain circumstances.
Title
Statewide Heart Attack Registry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1598 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1401 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1401/BillText/Filed/PDF |