FL H1397 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes person or entity completing financial report for association to rely on specified inspection report; restricting association from waiving financial report for more than specified period; requires association to provide candidate's certification form to unit owners for specified purposes; requires board to have certain condominium buildings inspected every 5 years by architect or engineer; requires architect or engineer to provide certain report back to board.
Title
Condominium Associations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1774 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1397 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1397/BillText/Filed/PDF |