FL H1385 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
Pending: House Government Operations Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires agencies to require vendor awarded competitively solicited contract for commodities or contractual services to use certified minority, woman-owned, or veteran-owned business enterprises as subcontractors or subvendors for at least specified minimum percentage of contract value; requires Office of Supplier Diversity to commission disparity study to review & evaluate use of minority, women-owned, & veteran-owned business enterprises within this state; requires study to be presented to Legislature; provides appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Contracting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1530 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287057Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback