FL H1385 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Pending: House Rules & Calendar Council Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DEP to utilize natural attenuation monitoring strategies to transition sites into long-term natural attenuation monitoring & evaluate certain costs & strategies; prohibits local governments from denying building permits under specified conditions; establishes low-scored site initiative; requires DEP to issue certain determinations & orders; provides funding for payment of preapproved costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petroleum Contamination Site Cleanup [EPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0030 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0973 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-19 Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
2010-06-01 Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147)
2010-05-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-30 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01694
2010-04-30 Received -SJ 01585; Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Transportation; Community Affairs -SJ 01585; Withdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Transportation; Community Affairs -SJ 01187; Substituted for CS/SB 2592 -SJ 01187; Read 2nd time -SJ 01187; Read 3rd time -SJ 01187; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 01187
2010-04-26 In Messages
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -HJ 01068; CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 01068
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00955
2010-04-16 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00732
2010-04-15 CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -HJ 00718; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-04-09 CS/CS by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00722
2010-04-07 On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 04/09/10, 11:45 am, Morris Hall
2010-04-06 Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00608
2010-04-02 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-04-05 CS read 1st time on 04/05/10 -HJ 00485
2010-03-26 CS by Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00489
2010-03-24 On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC), 03/26/10, 8:30 am, 306-H
2010-03-17 Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00341; Now in Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00342
2010-03-15 On Committee agenda-- Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), 03/17/10, 2:15 pm, Reed Hall
2010-03-10 Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00255
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00124
2010-02-26 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2592 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Read 3rd time -SJ 01187; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1385 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 01187; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) -SJ 01187
H1509 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1752; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208), CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) -HJ 01135
S1752 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-147; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 173 (Ch. 2010-128), CS/HB 969 (Ch. 2010-222), CS/CS/HB 1389 (Ch. 2010-226), CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/HB 7205 (Ch. 2010-140), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
03763071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1385&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb138500.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb138501c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb138502c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB13850426100973.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB13850430100030.html

Bill Comments

feedback