FL H1377 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation and Ports Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation and Ports Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises Florida Expressway Authority Act; revises provisions for membership on certain expressway authorities; provides for termination of membership upon violation or failure to comply with specified provisions; requires expression of support from local governmental authority before certain authorities may begin certain projects; authorizes certain expressway authorities to be redesignated as transportation authorities; authorizes such authorities to establish transportation reinvestment zones; provides for such authorities to receive ad valorem tax increment revenues; requires county to establish urban center infill nodes & redevelopment areas; exempts certain amendments to county comprehensive plan from review under specified provisions; authorizes DOT to allocate specified funds to certain authorities.
Title
Expressway Authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Transportation and Ports Subcommittee |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Ports Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 10:30 am, 12 HOB --Temporarily postponed |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Transportation and Ports Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1372 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
348 | 0002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
348 | 0004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |