FL H1375 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-237
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits battery by strangulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Battery by Strangulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#51 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#186 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-16 Chapter No. 2023-237
2023-06-14 Approved by Governor
2023-06-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2023-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2023-05-01HouseIn Messages
2023-05-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2023-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2023-05-01SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1334
2023-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2023-04-25SenateReceived
2023-04-21SenateReferred to Rules
2023-04-20SenateIn Messages
2023-04-20HouseCS passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
2023-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2023-04-20HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2023-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2023-04-13HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
2023-03-31HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2023-03-31HouseBill released to House Calendar
2023-03-31HouseReported out of Judiciary Committee
2023-03-31HouseFavorable by Judiciary Committee
2023-03-29HouseAdded to Judiciary Committee agenda
2023-03-21HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2023-03-21HouseReported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-21HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-17HouseAdded to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-15House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2023-03-15HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-15HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2023-03-15HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-14HouseCS Filed
2023-03-14HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-03-14HouseReported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-03-13HouseFavorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-03-09HouseAdded to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-09HouseNow in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1334 (Same As) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1375 (Ch. 2023-237)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
784031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/Amendment/904481/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/Analyses/h1375.CRJ.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/Analyses/h1375a.CRJ.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/Analyses/h1375b.JUA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/Analyses/h1375c.JUA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/Analyses/h1375d.JDC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/Analyses/h1375e.JDC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/Analyses/h1375z.CRJ.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/Analyses/h1375z1.CRJ.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=67078&IsPCB=0&BillId=78208
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=67497&IsPCB=0&BillId=78208
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=68469&IsPCB=0&BillId=78208
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=68524&IsPCB=0&BillId=78208
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/Vote/HouseVote_h01375c1186.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1375/Vote/SenateVote_h01375c1051.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback