FL H1373 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Chapter No. 2019-183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals special act relating to the establishment of a fair, neutral, & impartial system for administering employee discipline; requires that agency or authority previously covered under act must provide fair, neutral, & impartial system for administering employee discipline of suspension, involuntary demotion, or dismissal & appeals of such discipline.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hillsborough County Civil Service Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#104 (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08 Chapter No. 2019-183
2019-05-23 Approved by Governor
2019-05-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-16SenateReceived
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-11SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HousePassed; YEAS 113 NAYS 2
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-25HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-25HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1806 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1373 (Ch. 2019-183)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback