FL H1369 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Pending: House Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes only one avenue for disclosure of certain adoption related records without court order; removes authorization for certain adoption related records to be disclosed without court order; authorizes court to break seal of specified birth records upon request of certain persons under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Release of Adoption Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1390 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
382015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63162Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback