FL H1365 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Vulnerable Child Protection Act; provides criminal penalties for health care practitioners who engage in or cause specified practices to be performed on minor under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vulnerable Child Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall -- Workshopped
2020-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall -- Removed from meeting agenda
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1864 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4560335Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback