FL H1363 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides additional management strategies for such plans; requires certain plans to include specified elements; provides requirements for DEP, DACS, DOH, UF/IFAS, local governments, water management districts, & owners of agricultural operations; requires specified data collection & research; establishes nutrient reduction cost-share program within DEP; exempts rural homesteads from certain best management practices under certain conditions; requires DEP & DACS to include specified information in annual progress reports for such plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Basin Management Action Plans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in State Affairs Committee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-03HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-03HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-29HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-28HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-28HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-28HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1343 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 712 passed
S712 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-150
S1382 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
403067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4030675Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback