FL H1363 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-68
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-68
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies exemption from fee requirements provided for student who is or was at time he or she reached 18 years of age in custody of relative under Relative Caregiver Program or who was adopted from DCFS after specified date; provides that certain exemptions include fees associated with enrollment in career-preparatory instruction; deletes exemption associated with completion of college-level communication & computation skills testing program, etc.
Title
Postsecondary Student Fees [SPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0028 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0922 - Passage (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0922 - Passage (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-68 | |
2010-04-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700 | |
2010-04-26 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01093 | |
2010-04-26 | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Higher Education; Higher Education Appropriations -SJ 00816; Substituted for CS/SB 1148 -SJ 00816; Read 2nd time -SJ 00816; Read 3rd time -SJ 00816; CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 -SJ 00816 | |
2010-04-23 | In Messages; Received -SJ 00798; Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Higher Education; Higher Education Appropriations -SJ 00798 | |
2010-04-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01024; CS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 -HJ 01024 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00871 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00629 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00629 | |
2010-04-05 | On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 04/07/10, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-29 | Original reference(s) removed: State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); CS referred to Education Policy Council -HJ 00425; Now in Education Policy Council | |
2010-03-26 | CS read 1st time on 03/26/10 -HJ 00404; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-25 | CS by State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00409 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC), 03/25/10, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); Education Policy Council -HJ 00255 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00123 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1148 (Similar To) 2010-04-26 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00816; Amendment(s) adopted (345600) -SJ 00816; Substituted CS/HB 1363 -SJ 00816; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1363 (Ch. 2010-68) -SJ 00816