FL H1359 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 7, Art. IX of State Constitution to remove president of Florida Student Association, or equivalent, as member of Board of Governors of State University System & to require that Governor appoint state university student body president to Board of Governors; requires that state university student body president shall be one of 15 citizen members appointed to Board of Governors by Governor, except that state university student body president is not subject to confirmation by Senate & term of appointment is 1 year, etc.
Title
Board of Governors/Student Body President
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Corcoran [R] | House Education Committee | House K-20 Innovation Subcommittee | Rep. Alan Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-22 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 766 | |
2011-04-21 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-20 | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 -HJ 762 | |
2011-04-18 | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/20/11, 10:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-03-31 | Now in Education Committee -HJ 389 | |
2011-03-30 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-28 | CS by K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 391 | |
2011-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- K-20 Innovation Subcommittee, 03/28/11, 3:00 pm, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 222 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 124 | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |