FL H1357 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 10 (Ch. 2017-10)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 10 (Ch. 2017-10)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires SBA to provide certain water supply investment summary; requires OPPAGA to review & report on water projects; authorizes water reuse incentives; requires water supply plans to include certain projects; requires DEP to make certain reuse recommendations; limits use of Water Protection & Sustainability Program Trust Fund revenues.
Title
Reclaimed Water
Sponsors
Rep. Mel Ponder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 10 (Ch. 2017-10) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 03/27/17, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB --Temporarily Postponed |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1686 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 10 (Ch. 2017-10)
S10 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Chapter No. 2017-10
S10 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Chapter No. 2017-10
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 4745 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 852 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 853 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 890 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1357 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1357/BillText/Filed/PDF |