FL H1355 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to support H. Res. 621, Impeaching Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, of high crimes and misdemeanors, & impeach, try, & remove President Donald J. Trump from office.
Title
Impeachment of Donald J. Trump, President of the United States
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1355 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1355/BillText/Filed/PDF |