FL H1351 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises exceptions for licensee during Financial Technology Sandbox period; revises duties of money services businesses; revises violations of money services business activities; revises certain prohibited activities without license; revises requirements for money transmitter or payment instrument seller to conduct business; revises requirements for written contract between money transmitter or payment instrument seller & authorized vendor; provides requirements for money transmitter that receives virtual currency; excludes virtual currency in calculation of permissible investments; revises recordkeeping requirements for money transmitter or payment instrument seller; revises financial liability requirements for money transmitter or payment instrument seller.
Title
Money Services Businesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#283 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-23 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-23 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-19 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021) |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-04-01 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-22 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-18 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-18 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-18 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-05 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1758 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
559 | 952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 2085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |