FL H1349 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires students to receive instruction on history of Communism; requires DOS to provide recommendation to Legislature relating to creation of museum of history of Communism; creates Institute for Freedom in Americas at Miami Dade College; renames Adam Smith Center for Study of Economic Freedom as Adam Smith Center for Economic Freedom & revises goals of center.
Title
History and Instruction of Political and Socio-economic Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Choice & Innovation Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Choice & Innovation Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Laid on Table |
2024-03-01 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024) |
2024-02-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-22 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-22 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | PCS added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2024-02-14 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-13 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-13 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-13 | House | Favorable with CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-09 | House | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-02-01 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Favorable by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2024-01-30 | House | Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1264 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Chapter No. 2024-102
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 6496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 64991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |