FL H1347 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Chapter No. 2024-276
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Chapter No. 2024-276
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person from operating branch of business making consumer finance loans before obtaining license; revises maximum interest rates on consumer finance loans; revises minimum amount of time before delinquency charge may be imposed; requires licensees offering assistance program to borrowers after federally declared major disaster to send notice to office; requires licensees to offer to borrowers credit education programs or seminars; provides requirements for licensee claiming submitted information contains trade secret; requires licensees to suspend actions for certain timeframe after federally declared disaster.
Title
Consumer Finance Loans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#44 (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#813 (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#813 (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Chapter No. 2024-276 | |
2024-06-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 21 NAYS 18 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time 652 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1436 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-03-04 | House | CS passed; YEAS 104, NAYS 10 |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024) |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-19 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-16 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2024-02-06 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-02 | House | Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-26 | House | Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-13 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-13 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1436 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1347
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
516 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |