FL H1345 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises interest rate & penalty that applies to property owners who unlawfully received homestead exemption; revises criteria under which rental of homestead property is not considered abandonment for tax exemption purposes.
Title
Homestead Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Ways & Means Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-03 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-03 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1056 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
196 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |