FL H1345 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "Florida Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act"; prohibits abortion of unborn child capable of feeling pain; provides parameters for making such determination; requires physicians to report abortion information to DOH; provides criminal penalties & civil & criminal remedies; requires court ruling on protection of certain identifying information; creates special revenue account to pay for certain costs & expenses incurred by state in defending act.
Title
Termination of Pregnancy
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Gregory [R] | Sen. Erin Grall [R] | Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Rep. Mike Beltran [R] |
Rep. Cord Byrd [R] | Rep. Walter Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1347 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S558 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S560 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S558 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S560 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1345 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1345/BillText/Filed/PDF |