FL H1345 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises supervisory authority over taxpayers' rights advocate within DOR; provides that taxpayers' rights advocate may be removed from office only by Chief Inspector General; requires taxpayers' rights advocate to furnish an annual report; provides for appointment of taxpayers' rights advocate by Chief Inspector General.
Title
Taxpayers' Rights Advocate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1345 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1345/BillText/Filed/PDF |