FL H1341 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires specified annual appropriation to Florida Forever Trust Fund; prohibits moneys from Land Acquisition Trust Fund from being used for specified costs.
Title
Land Acquisition Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S944 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1341 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1341/BillText/Filed/PDF |