FL H1341 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises statewide student assessment program beginning with 2015-2016 school year; discontinues use of FCAT; requires use of subject area assessments in grades 3 through 5, subject area assessments & end-of-course assessments in grades 6 through 12, & diagnostic assessments in grades 6, 8, & 10; revises end-of-course assessment requirements; revises high school graduation requirements to include measure of overall academic performance; requires task force to recommend graduation standards for career-track students & ways to provide unique curriculum offerings, etc.
Title
Public School Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to K-20 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 221 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 121 | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 428 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 429 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 433 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1341 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1341/BillText/Filed/HTML |