FL H1335 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates task force for purpose of identifying & considering options for relocation of state capitol building, certain executive branch officers, & the legislature; provides for task force membership, duties, & dissolution; directs office of CFO to provide funding & technical & administrative support to task force; provides for report to be submitted to the Governor & Legislature; requires Legislature to take certain actions.
Title
Capitol Relocation Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1335 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1335/BillText/Filed/PDF |