FL H1335 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises membership & terms of office of members of governing body of authority.
Title
Emergency Medical Services Authority, Pinellas County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#342 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2015-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 6 |
2015-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15 |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-10 | House | CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-10 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-09 | House | CS by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed |