FL H1333 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits state & local law enforcement agencies, school officers, & security agencies, from certain actions for purposes of immigration enforcement; requires agencies to review & revise confidentiality policies; prohibits agencies from making inquiry or recording information concerning person's immigration status; requires AG, certain educational institutions, hospitals, & courthouses to develop & publicize certain policies; requires AG to prescribe format for persons to submit complaint; authorizes AG and state attorney to institute injunctive proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enforcement of Federal Laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1726 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
908101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908109Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback