FL H1331 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes municipality to fund or finance general government functions with portion of revenues from utility operations; establishes limits on utility revenue transfers for municipal utilities; modifies provisions relating to permissible rates, fees, & charges imposed by municipal water & sewer utilities on customers located outside municipal boundaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Utilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-21 - House - House Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05HouseDied in Commerce Committee
2023-03-23House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2023-03-23HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2023-03-23HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2023-03-23HouseOriginal reference removed: Appropriations Committee
2023-03-22HouseCS Filed
2023-03-22HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-03-22HouseReported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
2023-03-21HouseFavorable with CS by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
2023-03-17HousePCS added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-09HouseNow in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1380 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulated Industries
H361 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
S1712 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
166201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
180191Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback