FL H1331 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defines "bingo card minder"; renames "instant bingo" as "pull tab game"; requires bingo card minder software be certified; requires such certification be available upon request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bingo

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1912 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8490931Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback