FL H1331 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "bingo card minder"; renames "instant bingo" as "pull tab game"; requires bingo card minder software be certified; requires such certification be available upon request.
Title
Bingo
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1912 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1331 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1331/BillText/Filed/PDF |