FL H1331 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Classroom Teacher Student Loan Forgiveness Program; provides requirements for program; requires SBE to waive certain fees for individuals taking certain examinations for first time; repeals Florida Best & Brightest Teacher Scholarship Program & Florida Best & Brightest Principal Scholarship Program.
Title
Classroom Teachers and School Principals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1009 | 951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1331 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1331/BillText/Filed/PDF |