FL H1331 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes condition under which student may use Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program award for summer term enrollment & provides funding; revises certain initial eligibility criteria for specified awards under program; specifies amounts of certain awards eligible to cover specified expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1752 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
H423 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 4
S4 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-4

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100922Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100924Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100953Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009534Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009535Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback