FL H1323 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Marriage Education Committee; provides for membership & terms of members; provides for creation of Florida Guide to a Healthy Marriage; requires committee to submit completed guide to Governor & Legislature; provides content; requires committee to obtain private funds for design, layout, printing, & distribution costs; provides for distribution; provides an exemption; encourages clerks of court to provide list of course providers & websites; requires committee to provide report to Governor & Legislature; provides for review & revision of guide; prohibits issuance of marriage license until petitioners verify both parties have obtained & read guide or other presentation of similar information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Guide to a Healthy Marriage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Judiciary Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-31HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-01-30HouseFavorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2018-01-24HouseNow in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 4
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-01-12HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1580 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7410307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74104Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback