FL H1323 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises district boundaries to include City of Daytona Beach.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Daytona Beach Racing and Recreational Facilities District, Volusia County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseDied on Calendar
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-07HouseCS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2017-04-07HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-04-06HouseCS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2017-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2017-03-29HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-03-29HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2017-03-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/29/17, 11:30 am, Morris Hall
2017-03-21HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2017-03-21HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-03-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB
2017-03-10HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback