FL H1323 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires instructional staff of public schools to provide instruction to certain students about responsible use of social media by specified school year; requires Commissioner of Education to provide school districts with certain information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Instruction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in K-12 Subcommittee
2016-01-15HouseReferred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2016-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1590 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback