FL H1323 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides asset transfer limitations for determination of eligibility for certain nursing facility services under Medicaid program after specified date; requires DCF to determine institutional spouse ineligible for Medicaid under certain circumstances; authorizes Agency for Health Care Administration to recover certain Medicaid expenses; authorizes DCF to adopt rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid Eligibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#289 (Y: 80 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2013-04-29SenateReceived
2013-04-26SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2013-04-26SenateIn Messages
2013-04-26HouseCS passed; YEAS 80 NAYS 35
2013-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-25HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2013-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-23HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13
2013-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-04-02HouseFavorable by- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4
2013-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/13, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2013-03-26HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2013-03-25HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2013-03-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-03-19HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2
2013-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 2:00 pm, 306 HOB
2013-03-08HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-03-04HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409902Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1323
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1323/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1323/BillText/c1/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1323/Amendment/170777/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1323/Amendment/236167/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1323/Amendment/839697/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1323/Amendment/491113/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1323/Amendment/598859/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1323/Amendment/277617/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1323/FloorVotes/ibLBsDG%2FMBs%2FgAZfm%3DPL%3DS0rs71wzw%3D%7C14%2FPublic%2FVotes%2FBill%2F20130426%2FHouseVote%5Fh1323c1289%2EPDF

Bill Comments

feedback