FL H1323 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers regulation of secondhand dealers from DOR to DOACS; revises recordkeeping requirements for pawnbroker & secondhand dealer transactions; revises requirements for contents & electronic transfer of pawnbroker & secondhand dealer transaction forms; requires pawnbrokers & secondhand dealers to transfer certain information to statewide central database; authorizes certain electronic records to be used as evidence; revises period for which secondhand dealers must maintain transaction records, etc.
Title
Pawnbroker and Secondhand Dealer Transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 221 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 119 | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
538 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
538 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
539 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1323 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1323/BillText/Filed/HTML |