FL H1319 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates act "Public Employee Retirement Preservation Act"; requires certain public employees to contribute an additional specified percentage of their gross income for certain purposes; provides requirements for certain retirement system or plan actuarial reports & experience studies; provides for closing of certain plans; provides maximum retirement benefit for certain retirement system or plan members, etc.
Title
Governmental Retirement Systems
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Grady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00206 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00119 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1902 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
H1543 (Similar To) 2010-03-24 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn from further consideration -HJ 00385
H1543 (Similar To) 2010-03-24 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn from further consideration -HJ 00385
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0112 | 049 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 4501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0122 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0175 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0175 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0175 | 162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0175 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0185 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0185 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0185 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0185 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0185 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0214 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0214 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0214 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |