FL H1315 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Redefines term "special risk member"; revises criteria for membership in special risk class to include court deputies; provides legislative findings that act fulfills important state interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Retirement System

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
2010-03-03 Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00206
2010-03-02 Introduced -HJ 00118
2010-02-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1204 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
S1996 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0121021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01210515Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback