FL H1311 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands Medicaid coverage for certain individuals by specified date; requires AHCA to submit request for amendment of state Medicaid plan to implement such expansion; requires implementation of Florida COMPASS demonstration project & TEEOP for participation by certain eligible individuals; provides eligibility & participation criteria; creates Medicaid Access & Coverage Council within AHCA; provides appropriations & authorizes FTE positions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Medicaid Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-03HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
395701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4099035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4099645Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback