FL H1307 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-180
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-180
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for excess account balances in Public Employee Optional Retirement Program when employee transfers to defined benefit program; establishes forfeiture account in Public Employee Retirement Program TF; requires that SBA create audit committee for specified purposes; requires that contract for investment advisor or manager include standard of conduct, etc.
Title
State Financial Matters [GPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0026 - House Message (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - House Roll Call No. 1087 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0021 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House Roll Call No. 0820 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - House Roll Call No. 1087 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0021 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House Roll Call No. 0820 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-180 | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 01694 | |
2010-04-30 | In returning messages; Concurred (493411) -SJ 01185; CS passed as amended (493411); YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 01185 | |
2010-04-30 | Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted -HJ 01310; Concurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended -HJ 01310; CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 01310 | |
2010-04-26 | In returning messages | |
2010-04-26 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00812; Amendment(s) adopted (556716) -SJ 00813; CS passed as amended (556716); YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 00813 | |
2010-04-23 | Received -SJ 00800; Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00801; Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00786; Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1078 -SJ 00787; Read 2nd time -SJ 00787 | |
2010-04-20 | In Messages | |
2010-04-20 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00772; CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00772 | |
2010-04-19 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00747; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00747 | |
2010-04-09 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00655 | |
2010-04-08 | CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -HJ 00644; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-04-07 | CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00648 | |
2010-04-05 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00409; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00409 | |
2010-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC), 03/26/10, 8:30 am, 116-K | |
2010-03-17 | Now in Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00340 | |
2010-03-16 | CS read 1st time on 03/16/10 -HJ 00300; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-10 | CS by Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00303 | |
2010-03-08 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/10/10, 8:00 am, 306-H | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00205 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00117 | |
2010-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0413 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180)
S0660 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180)
S1078 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00787; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1307 -SJ 00787; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180) -SJ 00787
H1345 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180)
S1530 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180)
S2186 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180)
S2022 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180)
H5607 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
S0660 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180)
S1078 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00787; Substituted CS/CS/HB 1307 -SJ 00787; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180) -SJ 00787
H1345 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180)
S1530 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180)
S2186 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180)
S2022 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Senate, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1307 (Ch. 2010-180)
H5607 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00011; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0121 | 4501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 4502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0121 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 444 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 4754 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 4755 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0218 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |