FL H1305 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an additional manner in which subcontractor who engages in public or private construction must secure & maintain workers' compensation for employees; provides that if employee leasing company's client company is subcontractor engaged in construction industry, employees of subcontractor are deemed employees of employee leasing company for purposes of workers' compensation coverage; requires employee leasing company to provide notice of intent to terminate contractual arrangement to specified client companies; requires that employee leasing company provide written notice of termination of contractual arrangement with client company that is subcontractor engaged in construction industry to certain employees & contractors; requires employee leasing company to continue workers' compensation coverage for specified period after termination of contractual arrangement.
Title
Workers' Compensation Insurance for Employee Leasing Companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Original reference removed: State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-25 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1458 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
440 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 529 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |