FL H1305 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits specified activities relating to orcas; provides exceptions & penalties.
Title
Florida Orca Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1305 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1305/BillText/Filed/PDF |